Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Juan Cardinal Hurtado de Mendoza

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1548¹BornGuadalajara, Spain
18 Dec 158739.9Elevated to Cardinal
6 Mar 158941.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina
6 Jan 159244.0DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Hurtado de Mendoza:
Juan Cardinal Hurtado de Mendoza (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina

  • a cardinal for 4.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1587
  • b: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 247, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015