Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Paul Hugentobler, S.M.B. †

Deceased

Prefect of Qiqihar [Tsitsihar], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1893Born
20 Mar 192027.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Bethlehem Mission Immensee
1933²39.9AppointedPro-Prefect of Qiqihar [Tsitsihar], China
9 Nov 193441.8AppointedPrefect of Qiqihar [Tsitsihar], China
27 Jun 197279.4DiedPrefect of Qiqihar [Tsitsihar], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul Hugentobler
Father Paul Hugentobler S.M.B. (born , died ) Prefect of Qiqihar [Tsitsihar]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOberbüren, Diocese of Sankt Gallen, Switzerland
Death PlaceMenznau

  • a priest for 52.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 10 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast