Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann von Hoya

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Hildesheim


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Sep 1394AppointedBishop of Paderborn, Germany
28 Feb 1399AppointedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
May 1424²ResignedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
12 May 1424DiedBishop Emeritus of Hildesheim, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann von Hoya: VIAF:86111556
Bishop Johann von Hoya (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Hildesheim

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 385, and Page 277

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 24 Jan 2016