Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Georg (Karl Maria} Holzherr, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Maria Einsiedeln


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1927BornNeuendorf
8 Sep 194922.6ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
24 Jun 195326.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
10 Oct 196942.7SelectedAbbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland
3 Nov 196942.8ConfirmedAbbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland
22 Nov 196942.8InstalledAbbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland
9 Nov 200174.8RetiredAbbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland
26 Feb 201285.1DiedAbbot Emeritus of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Georg (Karl Maria} Holzherr:
Abbot Georg (Karl Maria} Holzherr O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Maria Einsiedeln

  • a priest for 58.7 years

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 29 Feb 2012
  • prof: CB, 29 Feb 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013