Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Paul-Joseph Hoffer, S. M. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Society of Mary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1906Born
9 Aug 195650.4AppointedSuperior General of Society of Mary
12 Aug 197165.4ResignedSuperior General of Society of Mary
28 Mar 197670.1DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Society of Mary

MicroData Summary for Paul-Joseph Hoffer (VIAF: 45915039)
Father Paul-Joseph Hoffer S. M. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Society of Mary

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBindernheim, France

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast