Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Hildebrandi

Deceased

Archbishop of Riga


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Jun 1484AppointedArchbishop of Riga, Latvia
13 Jun 1484Ordained BishopArchbishop of Riga, Latvia
5 Feb 1509DiedArchbishop of Riga, Latvia

MicroData Summary for Michael Hildebrandi:
Archbishop Michael Hildebrandi (died ) Archbishop of Riga

  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 223
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,400

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013