Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Santiago Hernández, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}

Titular Bishop of Hierocaesarea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1723²BornMelgar del Arriba, Spain
13 Aug 175734.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam
13 Aug 175734.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierocaesarea
18 Sep 175734.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierocaesarea
6 Feb 177754.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Santiago Hernández:
Bishop Santiago Hernández O.P. (born 1723, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}

  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 75, Number 371
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1757, Number 27
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 235, and Page 455

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 7 Dec 2015