Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Bernard Pierre Herrmann, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Cimbebasia Inferiore, Namibia

Priest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1864Born
1885²20.3First VowsMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
1886²21.3Solemn VowsMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
1890²25.3Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
1898¹33.3AppointedPrefect of Cimbebasia Inferiore, Namibia
1901²36.3ResignedPrefect of Cimbebasia Inferiore, Namibia
5 Oct 196096.1DiedPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernard Pierre Herrmann
Father Bernard Pierre Herrmann O.M.I. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Cimbebasia Inferiore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlsace-Lorraine, France
Death PlaceNew Orleans, Archdiocese of New Orleans, Louisiana, USA

  • a priest for 70.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 22 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast