Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philipp von Henneberg

Deceased

Bishop of Bamberg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1430¹Born
10 Feb 147545.1SelectedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
12 Apr 147545.2ConfirmedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
20 Aug 147545.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bamberg, Germany
26 Jan 148757.0DiedBishop of Bamberg, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philipp von Henneberg (VIAF: 30336547)
Bishop Philipp von Henneberg (born 1430, died ) Bishop of Bamberg

  • a bishop for 11.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,361
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 102
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1475, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 20 Nov 2018

Quantcast