Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Hemenhale

Deceased

Bishop of Worcester, England


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Mar 1337AppointedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
30 Mar 1337Ordained BishopBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
21 Dec 1338DiedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Hemenhale:
Bishop Thomas Hemenhale (died ) Bishop of Worcester

  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 529
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 74
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013