Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis de Haraucourt

Deceased

Bishop of Verden, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Jul 1430AppointedBishop of Verden, Germany
17 May 1437AppointedBishop of Toul, France
28 Jan 1449AppointedBishop of Verden, Germany
1456¹DiedBishop of Verden, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis de Haraucourt
Bishop Louis de Haraucourt (died 1456) Bishop of Verden

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 258, and Page 269
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 531

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast