Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andreas Hao Jinli (Hao Zhenli)

Deceased

Bishop of Xiwanzi-Chongli [Siwantze], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1916Born
11 Apr 194326.3Ordained PriestPriest
14 Sep 198467.7Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Xiwanzi-Chongli [Siwantze], China
1988²71.0AppointedBishop of Xiwanzi-Chongli [Siwantze], China
9 Mar 201194.2DiedBishop of Xiwanzi-Chongli [Siwantze], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andreas Hao Jinli (Hao Zhenli)
Bishop Andreas Hao Jinli (Hao Zhenli) (born , died ) Bishop of Xiwanzi-Chongli [Siwantze]

EventPlace
Death PlaceGonghui village

  • a priest for 67.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 24 Dec 2019
  • b/c2?: Clandestine Episcopal Ordinations in China, Year 2018, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast