Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg Hammer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Magdeburg

Titular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1582²BornRheinzabern
1 May 160826.3Ordained PriestPriest
26 May 162947.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Magdeburg, Germany
26 May 162947.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Palaestina
14 Jul 163048.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diocaesarea in Palaestina
7 Sep 163957.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Magdeburg, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Georg Hammer:
Bishop Georg Hammer (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Magdeburg

  • a priest for 31.3 years
  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,539
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,005
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 175

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013