Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Hamilton

Deceased

Archbishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1511¹Born
17 Dec 154433.9AppointedBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain
1546¹35.0Ordained BishopBishop of Dunkeld, Scotland, Great Britain
28 Nov 154736.9AppointedArchbishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain
7 Apr 157160.2DiedArchbishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Hamilton (VIAF: 52774249)
Archbishop John Hamilton (born 1511, died ) Archbishop of Saint Andrews

EventPlace
Death PlaceStirling

  • a bishop for 25.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 108, and Page 189
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1544, Number 27*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast