Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Youssef Habib Akouri

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

Note(s): (Sa´da (Sidone)/Maronite)


Events

DateEventTitle
1626²AppointedBishop
1626²Ordained BishopBishop
15 Aug 1644ElectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
3 Nov 1647DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Youssef Habib Akouri
(WikiData: Q68906168)
Patriarch Youssef Habib Akouri (died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a bishop for 21.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 87
  • b: CB, 26 Apr 2014
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,137
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1626, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024