Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hildeward von Werl (Halberstadt)

Deceased

Bishop of Halberstadt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
923¹Born
27 Feb 96845.1AppointedBishop of Halberstadt, Germany
21 Dec 96845.9Ordained BishopBishop of Halberstadt, Germany
25 Nov 99673.8DiedBishop of Halberstadt, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Hildeward von Werl (Halberstadt) (VIAF: 69367530)
Bishop Hildeward von Werl (Halberstadt) (born 923, died ) Bishop of Halberstadt

  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,710
  • ob/c2+: ATh

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 8 Feb 2016