Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gundekar

Deceased

Bishop of Eichstätt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1019Born
20 Aug 105738.0AppointedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
2 Aug 107555.9DiedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany

MicroData Summary for Gundekar (VIAF: 54946458)
Bishop Gundekar (born , died ) Bishop of Eichstätt

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 9 Feb 2016