Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Louis III Cardinal de Guise de Lorraine

Deceased

Archbishop-Elect of Reims, France

Titular See: (never ordained Deacon, Priest, or Bishop)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1575Born
160125.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Reims, France
10 Jan 160529.9SucceededArchbishop of Reims, France
2 Dec 161540.8Elevated to Cardinal
18 Jun 162146.4DiedArchbishop-Elect of Reims, France

MicroData Summary for Louis III de Guise de Lorraine (VIAF: 14866112)
Louis III Cardinal de Guise de Lorraine (born , died ) Archbishop-Elect of Reims

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLorraine

  • a cardinal for 5.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Dec 1615

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast