Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bartolomeo Cardinal Guidiccioni

Deceased

Bishop of Lucca

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1470BornLucca
12 Dec 153969.9AppointedBishop of Teramo, Italy
19 Dec 153970.0Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jan 154070.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Cesareo in Palatio
22 Mar 154272.2ResignedBishop of Teramo, Italy
24 Sep 154373.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
26 May 154676.4AppointedBishop of Lucca, Italy
28 Aug 154676.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lucca, Italy
4 Nov 154979.8DiedBishop of Lucca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Guidiccioni:
Cardinal Bartolomeo Guidiccioni (died ) Bishop of Lucca

  • a bishop for 3.2 years
  • a cardinal for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Dec 1539
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 112, and Page 229

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013