Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Girolamo Cardinal Guglielmi

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1694Born
12 Jun 174550.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Sep 175964.8Elevated to Cardinal
19 Nov 175964.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio
15 Nov 177378.9DiedCardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio

MicroData Summary for Pietro Girolamo Guglielmi
Pietro Girolamo Cardinal Guglielmi (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santissima Trinità al Monte Pincio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIesi, Italy

  • a cardinal for 14.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Sep 1759

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast