Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guglielmo (Alessandro) , O.S.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Ivrea, Italy

Titular Bishop of Nicomedia


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Mar 1525AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ivrea, Italy
6 Mar 1525AppointedTitular Bishop of Nicomedia
30 Apr 1525Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nicomedia
1549²DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Ivrea, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guglielmo (Alessandro)
Bishop Guglielmo (Alessandro) O.S.A. (died 1549) Auxiliary Bishop of Ivrea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVercelli, Diocese of Vercelli
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 23.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 257
  • bp/d: CB, 24 Jul 2014
  • bp/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1525, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Jun 2018

Quantcast