Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matteo Andrea Guerra

Deceased

Bishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Jan 1567AppointedBishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy
9 Feb 1567Ordained BishopBishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy
30 Jan 1576AppointedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
1578²DiedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matteo Andrea Guerra
Bishop Matteo Andrea Guerra (died 1578) Bishop of San Marco (Argentano)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 234, and Page 200
  • ob/c2+: CB, 18 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1567, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast