Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Charles Guérin

Deceased

Prefect of Ghardaïa, Algeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1872Born
19 Dec 189624.5Ordained PriestPriest
1901²28.6AppointedPrefect of Ghardaïa, Algeria
19 Mar 191037.8DiedPrefect of Ghardaïa, Algeria

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles Guérin
Father Charles Guérin (born , died ) Prefect of Ghardaïa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSeine-et-Marne, France
Death PlaceGhardaïa, Prefecture Apostolic of Ghardaïa

  • a priest for 13.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast