Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gonzalo Cardinal Gudiel

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1238¹BornToledo
1272²34.0AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Spain
27 Sep 127537.7AppointedBishop of Burgos, Spain
3 May 128042.3AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
4 Dec 129860.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
4 Dec 129860.9Elevated to Cardinal
Dec 1299³61.9DiedCardinal-Bishop of Albano

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gonzalo Gudiel:
Gonzalo Cardinal Gudiel , of (unknown)

  • a cardinal for 1.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 4 Dec 1298

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 3 Feb 2014