Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Filippo Cardinal Guastavillani

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio

Chamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1541Born
5 Jul 157432.7Elevated to Cardinal
14 Jul 157432.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Nuova
8 Nov 157736.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
19 Dec 158342.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
14 May 158442.6AppointedChamberlain (Camerlengo) of the Apostolic Chamber
7 Jan 158745.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
17 Aug 158745.8DiedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio

MicroData Summary for Filippo Guastavillani (VIAF: 9771816)
Filippo Cardinal Guastavillani (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Italy

  • a cardinal for 13.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Jul 1574

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast