Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Riccardo Luca Guariglia, O.S.B.

Abbot of Montevergine, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1967 Born
18 Oct 199326.6ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
1997²29.8Solemn VowsMember of Order of Saint Benedict
29 Apr 200033.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
20 Sep 201447.5AppointedAbbot of Montevergine, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Riccardo Luca Guariglia
Abbot Riccardo Luca Guariglia O.S.B. (born ) Abbot of Montevergine

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Maria di Castellabate

Please contact the Abbot through the Territorial Abbey of Montevergine.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Sep 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast