Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Berenguer de Guardia (Çaguardia)

Deceased

Bishop of Vic


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Sep 1306AppointedBishop of Vic, Spain
18 Dec 1306Ordained BishopBishop of Vic, Spain
16 Oct 1328DiedBishop of Vic, Spain

MicroData Summary for Berenguer de Guardia (Çaguardia):
Bishop Berenguer de Guardia (Çaguardia) (died ) Bishop of Vic

  • a bishop for 21.8 years

Source(s):
  • ob/c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,893
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 525

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 9 Jan 2014