Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann von Grumbach

Deceased

Bishop of Würzburg


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Jun 1455AppointedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
27 Jun 1456Ordained BishopBishop of Würzburg, Germany
11 Apr 1466DiedBishop of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann von Grumbach:
Bishop Johann von Grumbach (died ) Bishop of Würzburg

  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 163
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,605
  • b: Germania Sacra: Neue Folge, Volume 13, Page 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015