Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stefano Grube

Deceased

Archbishop of Riga, Latvia


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Mar 1474AppointedBishop of Troia, Italy
22 Mar 1480AppointedArchbishop of Riga, Latvia
26 Dec 1483DiedArchbishop of Riga, Latvia

MicroData Summary for Stefano Grube (VIAF: 169144782700705910023)
Archbishop Stefano Grube (died ) Archbishop of Riga

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 257, and Page 223
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1474, Number 23*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast