Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Raoul Cardinal Grosparmi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Evreux, France

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano


Events

DateEventTitle
1259¹AppointedBishop of Evreux, France
19 Oct 1259Ordained BishopBishop of Evreux, France
17 Dec 1261Elevated to Cardinal
17 Dec 1261AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
1263²ResignedBishop of Evreux, France
10 Aug 1270DiedCardinal-Bishop of Albano

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raoul Grosparmi
Raoul Cardinal Grosparmi (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Evreux

EventPlace
Birth PlacePériers, Diocese of Coutances
Ordained BishopSaint-Taurin, Evreux, Diocese of Evreux
Death PlaceTunis

  • a bishop for 10.8 years
  • a cardinal for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 234
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 44, Number 2,912

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast