Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Johann Cardinal Gropper

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Lucia in Orphea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1503Born
20 Dec 155552.8Elevated to Cardinal
13 Jan 155652.8InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Lucia in Orphea
13 Mar 155956.0DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Lucia in Orphea

MicroData Summary for Johann Gropper
Johann Cardinal Gropper (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Lucia in Orphea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSoest, Westphalia, Germany

  • a cardinal for 3.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1555

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast