Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Leonardo Cardinal Grosso della Rovere

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Agen

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli

Archpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1464BornSavona
9 Dec 148723.9AppointedBishop of Agen, France
1 Dec 150541.9Elevated to Cardinal
17 Dec 150542.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
15 Sep 150844.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Susanna
4 Mar 151753.2AppointedBishop of Lucca, Italy
9 Mar 151753.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
9 Mar 151753.2ResignedBishop of Lucca, Italy
Feb 151854.1AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
22 Mar 151955.2ResignedBishop of Agen, France
17 Sep 152056.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Agen, France

MicroData Summary for Leonardo Grosso della Rovere:
Cardinal Leonardo Grosso della Rovere (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Agen

  • a cardinal for 14.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Dec 1505
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 229

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013