Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nicola Cardinal Grimaldi

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana

Prefect of the Congregation of the Sacred Consulta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Dec 1645Born
11 Dec 170156.0AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Ecclesiastical Immunity
11 Dec 170156.0AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
17 May 170660.4Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 170660.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
1707²61.0AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Sacred Consulta
8 Jun 171670.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana
20 Sep 171670.7Ordained PriestPriest
25 Oct 171771.8DiedCardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicola Grimaldi
Nicola Cardinal Grimaldi (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Matteo in Merulana

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalazzo ducale Pietravairano, Teano, Diocese of Teano, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Santissima Concezione, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 1.0 years
  • a cardinal for 11.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 May 1706

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast