Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco-Paolo Grifi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Acerenza e Matera

Titular Bishop of ArsinoŽ in Arcadia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1764³BornMatera
20 Sep 178824.1Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jan 182863.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
28 Jan 182863.4AppointedTitular Bishop of ArsinoŽ in Arcadia
Feb 1828²63.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of ArsinoŽ in Arcadia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco-Paolo Grifi
Bishop Francesco-Paolo Grifi (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Acerenza e Matera

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1851, Page 78
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 90
  • b: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1828, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 24 Jun 2016