Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Clément Cardinal Grosso della Rovere, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mende, France

Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1462¹Born
27 Oct 148321.8AppointedBishop of Mende, France
29 Nov 150341.9Elevated to Cardinal
6 Dec 150341.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
18 Aug 150442.6DiedBishop of Mende, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Clément Grosso della Rovere
Clément Cardinal Grosso della Rovere O.F.M. Conv. (born 1462, died ) Bishop of Mende

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSavona
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for .7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Nov 1503
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 244
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1483, Number 48*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 192

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 9 Dec 2018

Quantcast