Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Galeotto Graziani, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy

Note/Previous Titular See: (O. Camald.)


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Sep 1520AppointedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
3 Jan 1521Ordained BishopBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
15 Apr 1522DiedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy

MicroData Summary for Galeotto Graziani
Bishop Galeotto Graziani O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}

  • a bishop for 1.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 143
  • ob: CB, 12 Jan 2013
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,629
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1521, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 8 Jun 2018

Quantcast