Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Grey

Deceased

Bishop of Lincoln, England


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Jul 1425AppointedBishop of London, England, Great Britain
26 May 1426Ordained BishopBishop of London, England, Great Britain
30 Apr 1431AppointedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
Feb 1436³DiedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William Grey:
Bishop William Grey , Bishop of Lincoln

  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 177
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 18, and Page 295
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 311
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 87

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Sep 2014