Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
13 Aug 1964 | Born | ||
15 Aug 1984 | 20.0 | Perpetual Vows | Member of Salesians of Saint John Bosco |
25 Jun 1994 | 29.8 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco |
22 May 2014 | 49.7 | Appointed | Under Secretary of the Dicastery for Legislative Texts |
(VIAF: 60195718; WikiData: Q1901522)
Father
Markus
Graulich
S.D.B.
(born )
Under Secretary
of Legislative Texts
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Hadamar, Diocese of Limburg, Germany |
Please contact the Father through the Dicastery for Legislative Texts.
|
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠