Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude de Granier, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1548¹Born
15 Dec 157830.9AppointedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
26 Apr 157931.3Ordained BishopBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
17 Sep 160254.7DiedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claude de Granier (VIAF: 315523440)
Bishop Claude de Granier O.S.B. (born 1548, died ) Bishop of Genève {Geneva}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYenne, Savoie
Ordained BishopDominican, Church, Annecy
Death PlacePolinge, Savoie

  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 201
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1579, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 May 2018

Quantcast