Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jens Grand

Deceased

Archbishop of Bremen (and Hamberg)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1260¹Born
18 Mar 129030.2AppointedArchbishop of Lund, Sweden
30 Mar 130242.2AppointedArchbishop of Riga, Latvia
1304²44.0ResignedArchbishop of Riga, Latvia
11 Feb 131050.1AppointedArchbishop of Bremen (and Hamberg), Germany
30 May 132767.4DiedArchbishop of Bremen (and Hamberg), Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jens Grand (VIAF: 13170109)
Archbishop Jens Grand (born 1260, died ) Archbishop of Bremen (and Hamberg)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 145, and Page 421
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 317

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.2, 25 Jan 2016; Data: 26 Jan 2016