Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Girolamo Gravina, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Patti, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1691Born
22 Sep 171423.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
6 Sep 175362.2SelectedBishop of Patti, Italy
10 Dec 175362.4ConfirmedBishop of Patti, Italy
16 Dec 175362.5Ordained BishopBishop of Patti, Italy
17 Apr 175563.8DiedBishop of Patti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Girolamo Gravina
Bishop Giovanni Girolamo Gravina C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Patti

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo

  • a priest for 40.5 years
  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 324
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1753, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast