Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father James C. Gould, S.J.

Prefect Emeritus of Marshall Islands, Pacific (Oceania)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1945 Born
4 May 197428.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
23 Apr 199347.8AppointedPrefect of Marshall Islands, Pacific (Oceania)
21 Dec 200762.5ResignedPrefect of Marshall Islands, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for James C. Gould
Father James C. Gould S.J. (born ) Prefect Emeritus of Marshall Islands

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJohnson City, NY

Please contact the Father through the Prefecture Apostolic of Marshall Islands.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Dec 2007

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast