Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Louis Cardinal de Gorrevod de Challand

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bourg-en-Bresse, France

Cardinal-Priest of San Cesareo in Palatio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1473¹Born
9 Aug 149926.6AppointedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
1515²42.0AppointedBishop of Bourg-en-Bresse, France
9 Mar 153057.1Elevated to Cardinal
16 May 153057.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Cesareo in Palatio
10 Apr 153259.2ResignedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
1534²61.0ResignedBishop of Bourg-en-Bresse, France
22 Apr 153562.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Bourg-en-Bresse, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis de Gorrevod de Challand
Louis Cardinal de Gorrevod de Challand (born 1473, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bourg-en-Bresse

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiedmont
Death PlaceSaint-Jean de Maurienne, Diocese of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Saint-Jean de Maurienne, Diocese of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne

  • a cardinal for 5.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Mar 1530
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 238
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1499, Number 2*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 8 Jan 2019

Quantcast