Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Guillaume Gonème, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Paphos, Cyprus


Events

DateEventTitle
16 May 1467AppointedArchbishop of Nicosia, Cyprus
13 May 1471AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Paphos, Cyprus
Sep 1473³DiedBishop of Paphos, Cyprus

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Gonème
Archbishop Guillaume Gonème O.S.A. (died Sep 1473) Bishop of Paphos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCyprus

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 24 Jul 2014
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,467, Number 38*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 202, and Page 212
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,471, Number 14*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast