Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Vincenzo Cardinal Gonzaga, O.S.Io.Hieros. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Alessio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1540Born
21 Feb 157837.2Elevated to Cardinal
21 Nov 157837.9InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
19 Dec 158343.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
18 Dec 158545.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
12 Jan 158645.0Ordained PriestCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
20 Apr 158746.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Alessio
23 Dec 159151.0DiedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Alessio

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Vincenzo Gonzaga
Giovanni Vincenzo Cardinal Gonzaga O.S.Io.Hieros. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Alessio

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalermo, Archdiocese of Palermo, Italy
Ordained PriestSan Lorenzo of Lucina, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Sant'Alessio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 5.9 years
  • a cardinal for 13.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Feb 1578
  • op: AT, 29 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 May 2017