Catholic-Hierarchy DC

(Layman) Ferdinando Gonzaga

Deceased

Note/Previous Titular See: (resigned the Cardinalate)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1587Born
10 Dec 160720.6Elevated to Cardinal
15 Feb 161022.8InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
19 Nov 161225.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Octaviae)
161527.6ResignedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Octaviae)
29 Oct 162639.5Died

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando Gonzaga (VIAF: 7543434)
(Layman) Ferdinando Gonzaga (born , died )

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMantua

  • a cardinal for 7.0 years (Resigned)

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Dec 1607

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast