Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch St. Lorenzo Giustiniani, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1381BornVenezia
12 May 143351.9AppointedBishop of Castello, Italy
5 Sep 143352.2Ordained BishopBishop of Castello, Italy
8 Oct 145170.3AppointedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
8 Jan 145674.5DiedPatriarch of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
16 Oct 1690Canonized

MicroData Summary for St. Lorenzo Giustiniani:
Patriarch St. Lorenzo Giustiniani C.R.S.A. (born , died ) Patriarch of Venezia {Venice}

  • a bishop for 22.3 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,007
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 120, and Page 264
  • crsa: CB, 16 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Jul 2014