Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Filippo Cardinal Giustini

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria

Priest of Tivoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1852Born
23 Dec 187624.6Ordained PriestPriest of Tivoli, Italy
28 Apr 190249.9AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
20 Oct 190856.4AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments
25 May 191462.0Elevated to Cardinal
25 May 191462.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
14 Oct 191462.4AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments
18 Mar 192067.8DiedPrefect of the Congregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments

MicroData Summary for Filippo Giustini
Filippo Cardinal Giustini (born , died ) Prefect of Discipline of the Sacraments

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCineto Romano

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a cardinal for 5.8 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast