Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon of Ghent

Deceased

Bishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Jun 1297SelectedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
22 Jun 1297ConfirmedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
20 Oct 1297Ordained BishopBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
31 Mar 1315DiedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Simon of Ghent
Bishop Simon of Ghent (died ) Bishop of Salisbury

  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 435
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 69
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 599

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast