Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Dalderby

Deceased

Bishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Jan 1300SelectedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
17 Mar 1300ConfirmedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
12 Jun 1300Ordained BishopBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
5 Jan 1320DiedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Dalderby
Bishop John Dalderby (died ) Bishop of Lincoln

  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 306
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 69
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast